KY HB433 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mar 14-WITHDRAWN
Title
Mar 14-WITHDRAWN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2017-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB433.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB433/bill.pdf |