KY HB431 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 382 to establish priority for purchase money deeds of trust and mortgages in certain instances; amend various statutes to conform; make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to the priority of purchase money deeds of trusts or mortgages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-18 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | introduced in House |