KY HB431 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.350 to define gray water and black water; allow for conservation credits for gray water systems that reduce the waste flow calculations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to update daily waste flow charts for low water using fixtures and allow gray water conservation credits; prohibit any political subdivision from prohibiting use of gray water reductions from systems approved under permit by the cabinet.
Title
AN ACT relating to water conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 108) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | passed 94-0 |
2016-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-04-01 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders #1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders #2 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2016-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 9, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-22 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | introduced in House |