KY HB429 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 180)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 180)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 411, requiring plaintiffs in medical malpractice actions to file a certificate of merit; repeal all sections in KRS Chapter 216C, the 2017 Medical Review Panel Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to medical malpractice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 967 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 186 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 186 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 180) |
2019-03-26 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 69-24 |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-20 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | introduced in House |