KY HB429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 184)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 184)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 196.026 to add a Division of Education to the Office of Adult Institutions in the Department of Corrections; confirm Executive Order 2017-268, dated May 1, 2017.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 756 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 293 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 293 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 184) |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2018-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 13, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-16 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-0 |
2018-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-23 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB429.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB429/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB429/vote_history.pdf |