KY HB428 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish KRS Chapter 403A and create new sections thereof to establish the Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act; amend KRS 403.280, 403.320, 403.340, 403.352, and 403.353 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] | Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] |
Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 205 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-18 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Courts
Courts, Family
Domestic Relations
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Parental Rights
Short Titles and Popular Names
Uniform Laws
Veterans
Courts
Courts, Family
Domestic Relations
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Parental Rights
Short Titles and Popular Names
Uniform Laws
Veterans