KY HB428 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 196.037 to allow Department of Corrections Internal Affairs officers and supervisors of the department to have the powers of peace officers while carrying out their duties; amend KRS 186.412 to remove the requirement that offenders released by DOC present a birth certificate in order to obtain a driver's license; amend KRS 237.110 to allow current and retired Department of Corrections officers who have completed firearms training to be exempt from training requirements for permits to carry a concealed deadly weapon; amend KRS 441.064 to ensure that the governing bodies of local correctional facilities are properly notified of findings of jail inspections and jail conditions; amend KRS 441.115 to require that jail employees receive training on communicable diseases. Amend KRS 441.045 to allow the release from custody to receive medical treatment of a person in the custody of the Department of Corrections who is placed in a local jail.
Title
AN ACT relating to corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126) |
2015-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill passed 97-1 |
2015-03-24 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-12 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | introduced in House |