KY HB425 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 148.850 by adding two members to the Tourism Development Finance Authority, one of whom shall represent the film industry and one of whom shall represent individuals with experience in financial management or economic development; confirm Executive Order 2016-210.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-6 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-08 | House | floor amendment (1-title) filed |
2017-03-01 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | introduced in House |