KY HB424 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 194A.990, 205.8463, 238.995, 341.990, 434.650, 434.655, 434.690, 514.030, 514.040, 514.050, 514.060, 514.070, 514.080, 514.090, and 514.110 to increase the felony threshold for theft and fraud offenses to $1,000, create a Class B misdemeanor level for theft and fraud offenses of $1,000 or less, and allow for aggregation of offenses that occur within 180 days to determine the appropriate charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 241 (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Judiciary (S)
2020-04-01Senatefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill
2020-03-19Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-18Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2020-03-18Senate1st reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2020-03-17Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-12House3rd reading, passed 73-17 with floor amendment (4)
2020-03-10Housefloor amendment (4) filed
2020-03-09Housefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed
2020-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-21Houseposted in committee
2020-02-18Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback