KY HB421 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 81)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 81)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.0147 to delete the Division of Special Investigations; amend KRS 42.0171 to create the Office of Budget and Fiscal Management in the Office of Administrative Services, which consists of the Division of Budget and the Division of Fiscal Management, delete the Division of Support Services, and provide that the Divisions of Human Resources, Postal Services, and Fleet Management report to the executive director of the Office of Administrative Services; amend KRS 42.724 to delete the Offices of Project Management, Field Services, and KY Business One Stop, rename the Office of IT Services and Delivery the Office of Infrastructure Services, rename the Office of IT Architecture and Governance the Office of Architecture and Governance, rename the Division of Enterprise Portfolios the Division of Enterprise Solutions, rename the Division of Applications the Division of Mainframe Services, rename the Division of Support Services the Division of Geographic Information Systems, rename the Division of Enterprise Governance the Division of Governance and Strategy, create the Office of Client Support Services consisting of the Division of Field Services and the Division of Support Services; amend KRS 131.020 to create the Special Investigations Division and the Division of Information Management in the Office of the Commissioner, rename the Office of Processing and Enforcement the Office of Registration and Operations, delete the Division of Collections and the Division of Application Development and Support, rename the Division of Registration and Data Integrity the Division of Registration, and create the Office of Enforcement; amend KRS 42.650, 42.738, 42.742, 42.744, and 116.200 to conform; confirm Executive Order No. 2020-0994, dated November 25, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1758 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 81) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2021-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-1 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | introduced in House |