KY HB421 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 367 to provide for a home owner's right to cancel a contract for the repair or replacement of a roof system upon a determination that the damage is not covered under applicable policies of insurance; require roofing contractors to include conspicuous notice of cancellation rights and procedures in roofing contracts; prohibit roofing contractors from requiring deposits or advance payment, except for emergency repairs necessary to protect the property from further damage, pending insurance claim determination; prohibit roofing contractors from offering or providing financial offsets or incentives against insurance policy deductibles or proceeds for use of their services.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance claims for residential roof repairs.
Sponsors
Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 97) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-28 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-27 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-20 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-03-14 | to Banking & Insurance (S) | |
2012-03-12 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-09 | 3rd reading, passed 83-0 with floor amendment (3) | |
2012-03-08 | floor amendment (3) filed | |
2012-03-07 | floor amendment (2) filed | |
2012-03-02 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2012-03-01 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2012 | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-29 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-21 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2012-02-16 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB421.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB421/bill.doc |