KY HB419 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require the Council on Postsecondary Education to annually compile data on in-demand jobs within the state and for each public postsecondary instruction and each campus of the Kentucky Community and Technical College System compile data relating to student success and costs; require Council on Postsecondary Education to develop delivery method to ensure access to information by prospective students; authorize Council on Postsecondary Education to promulgate necessary administrative regulations; cite as the Students' Right to Know Act; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to postsecondary transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1439 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 234 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 234 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105) |
2020-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | House | received in House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | passed 33-1 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) withdrawn |
2020-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | floor amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) filed |
2020-03-19 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2020-03-18 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2020-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-06 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-14 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Short Titles and Popular Names
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Short Titles and Popular Names