KY HB416 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Not accepted in Senate (violation of Senate Rules and Mason's Manual)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Not accepted in Senate (violation of Senate Rules and Mason's Manual)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 131.030 to make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to funding the Kentucky Retirement Systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Sannie Overly [D] |
Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Not accepted in Senate (violation of Senate Rules and Mason's Manual) |
2013-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 52-47 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-27 | House | floor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed |
2013-02-27 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-02-27 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-25 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-02-25 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-22 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-22 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | 1st reading |
2013-02-22 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | introduced in House |