KY HB41 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 422.285 and 17.176 to expand the availability of post-conviction DNA testing; amend KRS 524.140 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to DNA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 77) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | passed 96-0 |
2013-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2013-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2013-03-12 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2013-02-27 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |