KY HB408 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - to Health Services (S)
Pending: Senate Health Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - to Health Services (S)
Pending: Senate Health Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 222 to require treatment centers or programs licensed as a chemical dependency treatment service to provide transportation services to residents who wish to leave the program if the resident's family, guardian, or emergency contact does not agree to transport them; outline transportation service responsibilities; provide restrictions on where a resident can be taken; require that the facilities conduct a search of any outstanding warrants; exempt all facilities not licensed as a chemical dependency treatment service pursuant to KRS 216B.042; require the facility to notify family members, the county attorney, local law enforcement, and the court that a resident left the treatment facility in violation of a court order; allow a peace officer or a probation officer to arrest a resident without a warrant for violating the terms of the resident's conditional discharge or court order; prohibit treatment centers or programs licensed as a chemical dependency treatment service to recruit out of state residents into their facility if the out of state resident is dependent on Medicaid and require the treatment center or program licensed as a chemical dependency treatment service to submit to the Department for Medicaid Services the recipient's proof of residency when submitting a request for Medicaid reimbursement; require any out-of-state resident found to be ineligible for Medicaid services in Kentucky as a result of failing to establish Kentucky as his or her domicile to reimburse any Medicaid fees and to be fined; and amend KRS 205.200, relating to residency requirements for Medicaid, to prohibit relocation to Kentucky solely for receiving medical services using Medicaid and require proof of residency.
Title
AN ACT relating to health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 183 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 29, 2024 |
2024-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-20 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Alcoholism
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Medicaid
Transportation
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Medicaid
Transportation