KY HB404 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 184)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 184)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to allow commercial delivery personnel to use golf carts, low-speed vehicles, and utility vehicles for delivery of express mail and packages in residential areas; define "commercial delivery personnel," "residential area," and "utility vehicle"; outline use provisions; outline vehicle requirements; allow vehicles operating under this section to pull a trailer; allow the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to implement these provisions.
Title
AN ACT relating to commercial parcel delivery.
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 184) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 56-34 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | passed 25-13 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-30 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) (7) (8) (9) and (10) withdrawn |
2017-03-30 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) (7) (8) (9) and (10) ruled out of order |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) (7) (8) (9) and (10) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), (7), (8), (9) and (10) filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-03-29 | Senate | reassigned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 61-36 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | floor amendments (12), (13), (14), and (15) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2017-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-28 | House | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-22 | House | floor amendments (10) and (11) filed |
2017-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6), (7), (8) and (9) filed |
2017-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-16 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | introduced in House |