KY HB402 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 93)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 93)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 132 to require the valuation and assessment of real and tangible personal property of a municipal solid waste disposal facility be performed by the department; amend KRS 132.020 and 132.200 to provide that tangible personal property which is incorporated into a landfill facility shall be presumed to remain tangible personal property if the property is used for its intended purposes; amend KRS 136.120 to remove municipal solid waste disposal facilities from the list of public service companies.
Title
AN ACT relating to the taxation of property used as a landfill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 93) |
2016-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | House | received in House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-21 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-1 |
2016-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-02-12 | House | introduced in House |