KY HB402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Confirm Executive Order 2014-988, dated December 17, 2014, reorganizing the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 117) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill passed 100-0 |
2015-03-24 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2015-03-23 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-23 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-11 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | introduced in House |