KY HB400 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 118.720 to require the Governor to sign a proclamation for an election to fill a vacancy in the office of United States Senator; repeal KRS 63.200, which requires the Governor to fill vacancies in the office of United States Senator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to legislative vacancies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-03-29Housetaken from the Orders of the Day
2021-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021
2021-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-24Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2021-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-22Houseposted in committee
2021-02-10Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2021-02-04Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-04Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback