KY HB399 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 163)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 159 to allow children of military families who are transferring to Kentucky on official military orders to pre-enroll in a school district with official documentation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to children of military families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1032 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 204 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 163)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-06Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2019-02-28Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-21Houseposted in committee
2019-02-19Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-02-15Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback