KY HB398 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - to Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - to Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 315.136 and KRS 315.138 to require new pharmacy technician applicants and applicants whose registration has been expired for one year or longer to submit to a nationwide criminal background check by the Kentucky State Police and the FBI.
Title
AN ACT relating to pharmacy technicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitutes (1) floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, and (2-title) filed to Bill |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2016-03-10 | House | floor amendments (1) (2-title) (3) (4) and (5-title) withdrawn |
2016-03-01 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-02-29 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) and (3) and (4) and (5-title) filed |
2016-02-29 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for for Wednesday, March 2, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | introduced in House |