KY HB395 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend various KRS sections to provide that guardians ad litem and court-appointed counsel shall receive a fee not to exceed $500 and to specify the payors of those fees; amend KRS 625.0405, 625.041, and 625.080 to provide that the appointment of guardians ad litem and court-appointed counsel for voluntary or involuntary termination of parental rights proceedings shall solely be for representation at the trial level and shall not extend to the filing of an appeal nor to the appeal process thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to guardians ad litem and other court-appointed counsel and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 226 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-17Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-12House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1), and floor amendments (1) and (2)
2020-03-11Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 12, 2020
2020-03-09Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-13Houseposted in committee
2020-02-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback