KY HB395 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Confirm Executive Order 2014-986, relating to the reorganization of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and the establishment of the Radcliff Veterans Center.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] |
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-24 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-11 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB395.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB395/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB395/vote_history.pdf |