KY HB394 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.380 to expand procurement abilities to include transfers from other governmental agencies; amend KRS 45A.420 to allow for procurement when there is no vendor located in Kentucky; amend KRS 45A.425 to expand procedures for local public agencies to sell or dispose of surplus or excess personal property; amend KRS 82.083 and 424.260 to expand procedures for cities to sell or dispose of surplus or excess personal property and keep a written record; amend KRS 160.335 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-23 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-13 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-12 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-09 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-21 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-14 | to State Government (H) | |
2012-02-13 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB394.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB394/bill.doc |