KY HB393 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.786 to increase the dual credit tuition rate ceiling amount; add two career and technical education courses per year to the Dual Credit Scholarship; amend KRS 164.787 to delete the dual credit provisions from the Work Ready Scholarship.
Title
AN ACT relating to dual credit scholarships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 261 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-18 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Universities and Colleges
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Universities and Colleges