KY HB385 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 350.060 to require as of the effective date of the Act that any determination by the cabinet to change a bond requirement or bond amount currently in use result in a new administrative regulation that includes all bond requirements including the bond amount; proscribe bond amounts from being instituted as policy; require after the effective date of the Act an administrative regulation that fails to include bond amounts to be declared automatically deficient.
Title
AN ACT relating to coal.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-07 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-07 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-07 | passed 98-0 | |
2011-03-07 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-07 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-04 | to Rules (H) | |
2011-03-04 | received in House | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-04 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011 | |
2011-03-04 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill | |
2011-03-04 | recommitted to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2011-03-04 | taken from Rules (S) | |
2011-03-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-03-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-28 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2011-02-24 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-09 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2011-02-08 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB385.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB385/bill.doc |