KY HB384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 78.510 to 78.852 to provide that CERS employer contribution rates shall not increase by more than 12% per year over the prior fiscal year from July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2028; provide that CERS rate increase limit is retroactive to July 1, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to County Employees Retirement System employer contribution rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb384.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb384/orig_bill.pdf |