KY HB384 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.140)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.140)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 64 to provide for the voluntary creation of a local government emergency services personnel health and fitness-based incentive program.
Title
AN ACT relating to local health and fitness incentive programs for local emergency services personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch.140) |
2016-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-15 | House | received in House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 15, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 60-9 with floor amendment (1) |
2016-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-11 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | introduced in House |