KY HB380 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 64)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of Subtitle 12 of KRS Chapter 304 to permit insurers and insurance producers to offer gifts, conduct sweepstakes or drawings, and offer products or services for free or less than market value if certain conditions are met; amend KRS 304.12-110, 304.12-100, 304.15-712, and 304.17A-098 to conform; establish purpose of Act; title Section 1 of this Act the Kentucky Rebate Reform Model Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to insurance trade practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2212 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 158 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 64)
2022-03-25Housedelivered to Governor
2022-03-25Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2022-03-25Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2022-03-25Housereceived in House
2022-03-24Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2022-03-23Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2022-03-17Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022
2022-03-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2022-03-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2022-03-03Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2022-02-23Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-02-23Senatereceived in Senate
2022-02-22House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2022-02-17Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2022
2022-02-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-02-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2022-02-15Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2022-01-27Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-27Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback