KY HB38 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 17.545 to prohibit sex offender registrants from being on the grounds of a publicly owned playground without advance written permission.
Title
AN ACT relating to sex offender registrants.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] |
Rep. Wesley Morgan [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | passed 91-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-3 |
2017-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2017-01-03 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-09-14 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |