KY HB38 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 247.232 to define "zipline"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 247 to direct the Department of Agriculture to promulgate administrative regulations related to ziplines; require the department to establish administrative penalties and civil penalties.
Title
AN ACT relating to ziplines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2016-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-23 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-22 | House | received in House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-3 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-26 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-02-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 19, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-01-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |