KY HB377 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 173)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 173)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.1223 to provide discretion to the Workers' Compensation Funding Commission to consult with the Office of Financial Management and grant the commission the authority to also contract with outside investment firms within the parameters of KRS Chapter 45A, and require that the Office of Financial Management be consulted and participate in the selection of outside investment firms; however, the Funding Commission has the final approval. Fees for the outside contracts shall be paid from the investment earnings.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Workers' Compensation Funding Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 173) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 86-3 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-03-01 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-11 |
2017-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-16 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | introduced in House |