KY HB375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 36)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 36)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.3-070 to authorize an association, including incorporated and individual unincorporated underwriters, to transact insurance in this state subject to minimum capital and surplus requirements, subject to a restriction on association members to solely conduct the business of underwriting, provide an exemption from the definition of a Lloyd's plan insurer and the requirements of Subtitle 28 of KRS Chapter 304 relating to Lloyd's insurers, and allow qualification as eligible surplus lines brokers; amend KRS 304.3-120 to exempt associations and underwriters authorized to transact insurance in this state pursuant to Section 1 of this Act from the requirements of this section; amend KRS 304.10-070 to authorize associations, including incorporated or individual unincorporated underwriters, authorized to transact insurance in this state to place surplus lines coverage if the syndicates within the association are listed on the quarterly list of alien insurers maintained by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners.
Title
AN ACT authorizing associations and member underwriters authorized to transact insurance in this state to also qualify as eligible surplus lines insurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 36) |
2014-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-24 | House | received in House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-07 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2014-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-12 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB375.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB375/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB375/vote_history.pdf |