KY HB372 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 95A.055 to amend definitions; establish that only fire districts, as defined, provide administrative and budgetary and fiscal information; and establish that both fire districts and nonprofit fire departments are subjected to yearly financial review, rather than a review every 4 years.
Title
AN ACT relating to fire department reporting.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2302 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 124 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 124 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 157) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 14, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Public Records and Reports
Public Safety
State Agencies
Counties
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Public Records and Reports
Public Safety
State Agencies