KY HB372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 344 to set forth legislative findings; define "discriminatory actions," "religious organization," "state benefit program," and "state government"; set forth those religious beliefs or moral convictions protected by the Act; restrict state government from taking discriminatory actions against religious organizations for certain actions; allow a person to assert a claim against state government as a defense against certain discriminatory actions; require that a person assert a claim within two years; waive sovereign, governmental, and qualified immunities except those of liability under the Eleventh Amendment to the United States Constitution; declare that the protections of free exercise of religious beliefs afforded are in addition to protections under federal and state law and federal and state constitutions; specify that if any application or provisions of the Act that is held invalid under the law, the remainder of the Act and application of its provisions shall not be affected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to protections of religious organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 342 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-16House3rd reading, passed 85-2 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-15Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-22Houseposted in committee
2018-02-16Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-02-14Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback