KY HB371 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Establish a new effective date for 2011 Ky. Acts ch. 5, relating to procedures for transferring motor vehicles, by repealing Section 7 of the Act, which contained the original effective date, and by making the rest of the Act effective January 1, 2014.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 12) | |
2012-03-22 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-22 | received in House | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 | |
2012-03-21 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | to Transportation (S) | |
2012-02-22 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-21 | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 | |
2012-02-16 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-15 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2012 | |
2012-02-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-09 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-07 | to Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-06 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB371.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB371/bill.doc |