KY HB371 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.402 to include prescription assistance in the Kentucky Physicians Care Program and establish eligibility guidelines.
Title
AN ACT relating to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2011-02-23 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2011-02-16 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | posting waived | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-08 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-02-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB371.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB371/bill.doc |