KY HB370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 116)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 116)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.338 to establish an affirmative defense for an operator of a motorcycle for a violation of entering or crossing an intersection controlled by a traffic signal against a steady red light; establish criteria for an affirmative defense; provide that the affirmative defense shall not constitute a defense to any other civil or criminal action.
Title
AN ACT relating to traffic regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Michael Meredith [R] |
Rep. Ryan Quarles [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 116) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-10 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |