KY HB367 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 206)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 157 to create a dyslexia trust fund to be administered by the Kentucky Department of Education to finance grants to school districts for support of students identified with characteristics of dyslexia; require a report on expenditures from the fund; create a new section of KRS Chapter 186 to create a Dyslexia Ready to Read special license plate with extra fees funding the dyslexia trust fund; amend KRS 186.162 to establish the fees for the Dyslexia Ready to Read special license plate; amend KRS 186.166 to update the list of license plates to include the Dyslexia Ready to Read special license plate; APPROPRIATION; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT establishing support for dyslexia and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 507 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 2, SFTA 1 RSN# 694 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 282 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 206)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14HouseBill passed 87-0
2018-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-02Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-02Housereceived in House
2018-04-02Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-03-29Senatefloor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed
2018-03-29Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-29Senatetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-03-27Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-20Senatereassigned to Health & Welfare (S)
2018-03-20Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-15Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-13House3rd reading, passed 87-0
2018-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 13, 2018
2018-03-08Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-08Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-22Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-15Houseposted in committee
2018-02-15Houseto Education (H)
2018-02-14Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback