KY HB367 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Require the Kentucky Teachers' Retirement System (KTRS) board to provide the same dependent subsidy provided to state employees for the remainder of the 2017 plan year if the retired teacher participates in the Kentucky Employees Health Plan and selected couple, family, or parent plus coverage; provide that the KTRS board shall have the authorization to provide the dependent subsidy in the 2018 plan year; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to retiree health benefits from the Kentucky Teachers' Retirement System and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-27Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2017-02-24Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017
2017-02-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2017-02-22Houseposted in committee
2017-02-15Houseto State Government (H)
2017-02-14Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback