KY HB367 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 83A.045 and 83A.170 to require instruction of voters in a primary or regular election to vote for "up to" the number of candidates for which they may vote; amend KRS 83A.100 to require that the two (2) candidates for the office of legislative body member receiving the highest number of votes by eligible voters be deemed nominated from such ward; repeal KRS 83A.110 which provides staggered terms for legislative body members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to nonpartisan elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-02Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 17)
2014-03-21Housedelivered to Governor
2014-03-21Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2014-03-20Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2014-03-20Housereceived in House
2014-03-19Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2014-03-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 19, 2014
2014-03-19Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2014-03-18Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2014-03-18Senate2nd reading
2014-03-18Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2014-03-17Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2014-03-17Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2014-03-17Senate1st reading
2014-03-17Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2014-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2014-03-13House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2014-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014
2014-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-03-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2014-02-28Houseposted in committee
2014-02-11Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2014-02-10Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback