KY HB367 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 209 to define terms; create a new section of KRS 209 to require the CHFS to create and maintain an adult abuse registry; make the registry available electronically; prohibit unsubstantiated findings, prohibit placement of an individual on the registry unless all administrative appeals and judicial proceedings related to the appeal have been completed and upheld; prohibit a long-term-care facility or provider from employing an individual or volunteer whose name appears on the registry; amend KRS 209.140 to permit limited release of information related to the adult abuse registry to long term care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the protection of vulnerable adults.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-04Senateto Judiciary (S)
2013-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2013-02-26House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute
2013-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013
2013-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2013-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2013-02-20Houseposting waived
2013-02-20Houseposted in committee
2013-02-14Houseto Health & Welfare (H)
2013-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback