KY HB367 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-23 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 56.813 to increase from $1,000 to $5,000 the threshold amount for improvements of space leased by an agency to be amortized over the remaining term of the lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to property leased by the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-23 to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2012-02-21 received in Senate
2012-02-16 3rd reading, passed 98-0
2012-02-14 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2012
2012-02-10 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-02-09 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2012-02-08 posting waived
2012-02-06 to State Government (H)
2012-02-02 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback