KY HB367 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 12.020 to reorganize various entities within the Personnel Cabinet; rename the Department for Personnel Administration the Department of Human Resources Administration; rename the Office of Government Training the Governmental Services Center; rename the Department for Employee Insurance the Department of Employee Insurance; create the Office of Diversity and Equality within the Office of the Secretary; create the Center for Strategic Innovation within the Office of the Secretary; amend KRS 18A.025 to create the Division of Technology Services within the Department of Human Resources Administration; abolish the Division of Employee Benefits and transfer responsibilities to the Office of Employee Relations; abolish the Division of Communications and Recognition and transfer all duties to the Office of Employee Relations; rename the Division of Staffing Services the Division of Career Opportunities; amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to conform; and confirm Executive Order 2010-428.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-28 to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-24 received in Senate
2011-02-23 3rd reading, passed 99-0
2011-02-22 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011
2011-02-18 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-17 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2011-02-15 posted in committee
2011-02-08 to State Government (H)
2011-02-07 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback