KY HB366 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.380 to establish guidelines for the operation and management of the model and practice schools operated by Eastern Kentucky University; require the board of regents to adopt policies for the operation of the model and practice school; ensure model and practice schools and students eligible for state programs; establish a model and practice school advisory council; provide that for the purposes of determining equalization and local effort the model and practice school students shall be included in the residing district's average daily attendance; amend KRS 164.7874 and KRS 164.7885 to conform; repeal KRS 156.472, relating to textbooks for model and practice school.
Title
AN ACT relating to Eastern Kentucky University's model and practice school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1378 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 176 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 176 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 66) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | introduced in House |