KY HB366 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.380 to allow a superintendent's spouse who has at least 12 years of service in school systems to be an employee in the district in which the superintendent is employed.
Title
AN ACT relating to school employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 85) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-30 | passed 90-2 | |
2012-03-30 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-28 | to Rules (H) | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 27-7 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-27 | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading | |
2012-03-27 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-22 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1-title) filed | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-07 | to Education (S) | |
2012-03-05 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-02 | 3rd reading, passed 95-2 | |
2012-02-29 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2012 | |
2012-02-29 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-28 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-06 | to Education (H) | |
2012-02-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB366.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB366/bill.doc |