KY HB364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 214.160 to establish that all pregnant women be tested for hepatitis C and recommend testing for children born from a pregnant woman who has a positive hepatitis C test result.
Title
AN ACT relating to screening for hepatitis C.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-02-26 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-15 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | introduced in House |