KY HB363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 325.261 to eliminate experience gained from teaching accounting courses to satisfy the one year experience requirement; clarify the five year expiration period for exam scores; amend KRS 325.270 to eliminate adding an administrative regulation for reinstating exam scores; amend KRS 325.220 to include a new service under the definition of "attest service"; establish "report" as a new definition; amend KRS 325.280 to allow applicants in good standing from foreign countries to be issued licenses to practice without taking an exam if the authority that licensed the applicant in the foreign country already regulates the issuance of reports; amend KRS 325.301 to include a new exception for firms that aren't required to obtain a license to practice in the state; to remove "financial statements" as an item that requires a signature by applicants who are responsible for signing or authorizing others to sign reports on behalf of the firm; amend KRS 325.380 to prohibit those who do not hold a CPA license from using language conventionally used by licensees on any attest services.
Title
AN ACT relating to accountancy.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] |
Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 107) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-09 | Senate | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |