KY HB360 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct that any individual or business penalized by business license restrictions or fines under the Governor's emergency response to the COVID-19 pandemic shall have their license restored and fines refunded APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to businesses impacted by the COVID-19 response, making an appropriation therefor and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-10 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
Licensing
Local Government
Local Mandate
Small Business
State Agencies
Treasurer
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
Licensing
Local Government
Local Mandate
Small Business
State Agencies
Treasurer