KY HB360 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.135 to include in the definition of "state agency children" those children referred by a family accountability, intervention, and response team to a Department of Juvenile Justice operated or contracted day treatment program.
Title
AN ACT relating to state agency children.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 622 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 211 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 211 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 56) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-15 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB360.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB360/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB360/vote_history.pdf |